+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 49
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 443) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1401) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-08-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HSH/TRA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1017), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
- The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, English, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Inouye, Kidani, Slom.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH/TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HSH/TRA, WAM.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor