+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 46
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 393).
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Kim, Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-05-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3316) with recommendation of adoption.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-24-16 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2876), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-16 1:20PM in conference room 229.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor