+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to AEN/HHS.
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from AEN/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1438) with recommendation of adoption.
- One Day Notice 03-31-23.
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/HHS.
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor