+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 1, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 52
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 545) in amended form (SD 1).
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 06-30-20.
- Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3713) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara.
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-20 1:16PM in conference room 016.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN/WTL.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor