+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2031-18), recommending referral to FIN.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Gates, Ing, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Say.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 04-13-18 10:15AM in conference room 312.
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 53
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 544) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3457) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara, Ruderman.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to CPH.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3253), with recommendation of referral to CPH.
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-18 1:30PM in conference room 224.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN, CPH.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Offered.