+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 49
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 471) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1411) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-08-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1244), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 04-01-15 2:50PM in conference room 224.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-15 3:00PM in conference room 224.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor