+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 54
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 602) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 2). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-11-13.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1406) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2).
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-03-13 10:15AM in conference room 229.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
- Reported from HTH/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1006), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to CPN.
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Tokuda.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-13 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/TEC, CPN.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor