+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to HED, referral sheet 50
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, HED, referral sheet 49
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 469) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-09-15.
- Reported from HWN/HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1354) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele.
- The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kahele, Wakai.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN/HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-06-15 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN/HEA.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor