+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1165), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 1:20PM in conference room 224.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to AEN, WAM.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/ETT, WAM.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor