+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 47
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 458).
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3388) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom.
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-16 1:00PM in conference room 211.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3229), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 3:00PM in conference room 224.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to WLA, WAM.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (20)
K.KAHELE
Type:
Primary Sponsor