+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Certified copies of resolutions sent.
On April 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 820).
- Resolution adopted in final form.
On April 17, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2218), recommending adoption.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
- Transmitted to Senate.
On April 13, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Sayama, Alcos.
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to LGO, referral sheet 28
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 04-13-23 9:30AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On April 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 617) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1519) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
- One Day Notice 04-05-23.
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella.
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-23 3:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to LBT.
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to LBT/CPN.
On March 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor