+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 658).
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evans, Hashem, Say excused (3).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2072-18), recommending adoption.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-19-18 11:00AM in conference room 309.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from VMI/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2017-18), recommending referral to FIN.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson, Ward.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on VMI/EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-13-18 11:26AM, conference room 309.
- Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 04-13-18 11:26AM in conference room 309.
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI/EDB on Wednesday, 04-11-18 10:35AM in House conference room 309.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to VMI/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 52
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 466) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-02-18.
- Reported from ETT/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3348) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen.
- The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-18 1:30PM in conference room 414.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT/JDC.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor