+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
- The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN/WTL deferred the measure until 03-25-14 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-14 1:00PM in conference room 225.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN/WTL, WAM.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor