+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2268) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Wildberger; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 04-12-19 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 50
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 613).
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted with Senators English, Ihara, Nishihara, Rhoads, Riviere, Shimabukuro, and Thielen voting "Aye, with reservations"; and Senators Baker, Fevella, Gabbard, Harimoto, Inouye, Kim, and Moriwaki voting "No". Transmitted to House.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1831) with recommendation of adoption.
- One Day Notice 04-04-19.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1569), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET, WAM.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor