+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 333) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Kim.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor