+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1).
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 2:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-17 2:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; L. Thielen, Galuteria Co-Chairs.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Say, Thielen.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540).
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 499).
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1700), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308.
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1214) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Lowen, Fukumoto.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 03-15-17 10:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 317) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 567) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 1:30PM in conference room 211.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 485) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads K., Gabbard, Inouye, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Thielen L..
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-17 3:00PM in conference room 414.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor