+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s).
- Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Baker, Kouchi, Slom.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 582).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Floor Amendment No. 21 offered by Rep. Thielen.
- Floor amendment failed following a voice vote: Noes, 2 (Representative(s) Evans, Tokioka). Excused, 0 (none).
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, McDermott, Thielen voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1562) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, McDermott.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-13 3:58PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03/27/13.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-25-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1155), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision-making on Wednesday, 03-20-13 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-13 10:00 AM.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-13 8:30AM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-13.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-15-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 263) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 673) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English, L. Thielen ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 225) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor