+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1278), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1136) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-16-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 65) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-03-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 575) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 152) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to JDL, WAM.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor