+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 87) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi.
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU/HTH, WAM.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor