+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: J.Keohokalole Chair; K. Kahele, Kidani Co-Chairs; Fevella.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 758).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2149) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nishimoto, Todd.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from EDB/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1448) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamashita.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB/WLH on Friday, 03-15-19 11:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to EDB/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 307) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 943) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TEC/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 588) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-13-19 2:04PM in conference room 229.
- The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 02-13-19 3:22PM in conference room 414.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
- The committee(s) on TEC/WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-19 3:00PM in conference room 414.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 3:00PM in conference room 414.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to TEC/WTL, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor