+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TIA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 102) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Galuteria ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Green.
- The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kahele ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Kouchi.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-13 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to TIA/PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.