+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1200) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, LoPresti, Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-16-17 10:00AM in House conference room 312.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 309) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 787) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Taniguchi, Wakai.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 1:35PM in conference room 211.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 122) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor