+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 309.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 1:30PM in conference room 309.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 3:00PM in conference room 309.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 3:00PM in conference room 309.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 3:00PM in conference room 309.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Chun Oakland, Kidani, Kouchi, Ruderman.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, Nishimoto.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 578).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ing, Kawakami, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Cheape, Johanson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Say, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1471) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson, Ing; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Ward; and Excused: none.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Proposed House Draft of Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-04-13 2:14PM in conference room 308.
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 04-04-13 2:14PM in conference room 308.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-04-13 2:14PM in conference room 308.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-14-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 253) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 468) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Tokuda.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor