+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDL.
- Reported from TEC/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 265) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDL.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Tokuda ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC will hold a public decision making on 02-07-13 1:15PM in conference room 414.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green.
- Re-Referred to TEC/PSM, CPN/JDL.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 2:50PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to TEC/PSM, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.