+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1063) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 03-14-13 9:30AM in House conference room 312.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 250) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 820) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 284) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 2:55PM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor