+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 627) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor