+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1701) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Yamane.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-21-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 294) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 885) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Moriwaki ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere.
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 17) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.