+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-17-15 1:20PM in conference room 016.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 1:20PM in conference room 016.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HSH, JDL/WAM.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.