+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HOU, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 311) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH deferred the measure until 02-17-15 1:20PM in conference room 016.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH deferred the measure until 02-12-15 1:20PM in conference room 016.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH deferred the measure until 02-10-15 1:20PM in conference room 016.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH deferred the measure until 02-05-15 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-15 1:15PM in conference room 229.
- Referred to HSH, WAM.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.