+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-13.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:15PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04/01/13.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Monday, 03-25-13 2:20PM in House conference room 325.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 998), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, McDermott.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to VMI, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 30
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 246) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 526) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Taniguchi, Slom.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 10:45AM in conference room 229.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN.
- Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 104) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Kouchi, Slom.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-13 1:16PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to TIA, CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor