+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Act 173, on 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276).
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 173, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276).
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vetoed on 6-20-13 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236), line-item appropriations veto.
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed on 06-20-13 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236), line-item appropriations veto.
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-20-13 (Gov. Msg. No. 1235)
On June 21, 2013 in the House:
- Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1235)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 766).
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 760).
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none.
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-30-13 in Passing Final Reading.
- Deferred until 05-02-13.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred one day 05-02-13.
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 167) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 167).
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Luke, Takumi, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Ige, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kouchi.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 325.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Kouchi, Shimabukuro.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
- House conferees appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Takumi, Johanson.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 573).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1500) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1093), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-15-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 243) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Taniguchi). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 624) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-13 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 62) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-13 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor