+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 338) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 224.
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS, JDC.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor