+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 325.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Takumi, Johanson.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Kouchi, Shimabukuro.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 569).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1496) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1056), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6).
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-15-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 239) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Taniguchi). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 621) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-13 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 61) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-13 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor