+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HMS, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee on HSH deferred the measure.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-15 1:15PM in conference room 229.
- Referred to HSH, WAM.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor