+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 047, 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Act 047, on 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 107) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 107).
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Galuteria, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 1:35PM in conference room 423.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 1:35PM in conference room 423.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Galuteria, Nishihara Co-Chairs.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Ward.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540).
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 478).
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1668), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308.
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1208) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-17-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 290) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 784) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 9:35AM in conference room 211.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 401) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor