+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 40
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 54) in amended form (SD 2).
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 02-28-14.
- Reconsideration of action taken on 03-05-13 to Recommit to JDL/WAM.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to JDL/WAM.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 694) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman ; 5 No(es): Senator(s) Kidani, English, Espero, Tokuda, Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL/WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WTL, JDL/WAM.
- The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 11:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/THA/WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 220) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/THA/WAM.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ihara, L. Thielen.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 1:50PM in conference room 225.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WTL, JDL/THA/WAM.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/THA/EGH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor