+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1137) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-14-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 284) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 774) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 9:50AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 256) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor