+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 93) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.