+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-04-13 2:14PM in conference room 308.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:45PM in House conference room 308.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1071) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Wooley.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-12-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 227) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 774) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kouchi.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 178) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-13 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor