+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Kong, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1591) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Gates, D. Kobayashi, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1377) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
- Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 29
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 282) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 864) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 544) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 9:10AM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.