+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1193) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4).
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Hashem, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Yamane.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-21-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 30
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment failed as amended (SD 2) following Roll Call vote: Ayes, 1. Noes, 23 (Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Gabbard, Galuteria, Green, Hee, Ige, Ihara, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Kim, Kouchi, Nishihara, Ruderman, Solomon, Taniguchi, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Wakai). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro).
- Floor Amendment No. 1 offered.
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 34) in amended form (SD 1).
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 02-20-13.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 02-19-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 323) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor