+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor