+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.