+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 219) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 498) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor