+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to EDU/HMS, JDL/WAM.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to EDU/HMS/JDL, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
- Reported from EDU/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 97) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Slom.
- The committee(s) on HSH deferred the measure until 02-05-15 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU/HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 1:30PM in conference room CR229.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU/HSH, JDL/WAM.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor