+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from HOU/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 394) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On February 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads.
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HOU/CPN, WAM.
On January 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU/CPN, WAM/JDC.
On January 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced.