+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; L. Thielen, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Cullen, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; Okimoto.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 754).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2209) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:30PM in conference room 308.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1566) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1316) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Tuesday, 03-19-19 3:00PM in House conference room 312.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Okimoto.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:30PM in House conference room 309.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LHE, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 274) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1124) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 424) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 3:20PM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU/GVO, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor