+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 273) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.