+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1248) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ing.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-21-17 2:02PM in House conference room 309.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1108) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 03-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 312.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, HED, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 273) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 883) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Wakai.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM/JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 9:50AM in conference room 211.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDL.
- Reported from HRE/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 504) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDL.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HRE/HWN, WAM/JDL.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Kim.
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Taniguchi.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE/HWN has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-09-17 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE/HWN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-17 1:15PM in conference room 224.
- The committee(s) on HRE/HWN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-17 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE/HWN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.