+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 42) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-17 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.